VA SB1370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Semiconductor Manufacturing Grant Fund; creation. Creates the Semiconductor Manufacturing Grant Fund for the award of grants to a qualified semiconductor manufacturing company that makes a capital investment of at least $2.98 billion in a qualified locality and creates and maintains at least 1,106 new jobs with an average annual wage of at least $92,000. Such a qualified company would be eligible to receive a grant of $50 million in fiscal year 2020 and a grant of $20 million in fiscal year 2021, subject to total or partial recapture if the qualified company does not meet the performance metrics agreed to in a memorandum of understanding with the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to HB 2180.
Title
Semiconductor Manufacturing Grant Fund; created.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Norment [R] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Emmett Hanger [R] | Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] |
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 41 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1370ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House (93-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102238D |