VA SB1371 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Cigarette taxes; definitions of noncombustible tobacco products. Defines, for purposes of cigarette taxes, alternative nicotine product, heated tobacco product, liquid nicotine, and nicotine vapor product. The bill also provides that the definition of cigarette includes only nicotine-containing products that produce smoke from combustion. The bill extends from November 2018 to November 2019 the conclusion of a study by the Joint Subcommittee to Evaluate Tax Preferences of options for the modernization of cigarette taxes and possible reforms to the taxation of tobacco products that will provide fairness and equity for all local governments. The bill incorporates SB 1252.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarette taxes; definitions of noncombustible tobacco products, extends study report date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 790 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1371ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HousePassed House (93-Y 4-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseReported from Finance (19-Y 1-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1371S1
2019-01-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105549D-S1
2019-01-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-24SenateRead second time
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateIncorporates SB1252 (Reeves)
2019-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105549D-S1
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102721D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5811000(n/a)See Bill Text
5811021.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1371
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1371+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1371S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1371ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0790+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0079+SB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1371+SB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0178SB1371+SB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0179SB1371+SB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0180SB1371+SB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0127+SB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2753+SB1371

Bill Comments

feedback