VA SB1381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Student offenses reportable by intake officers to school division superintendents. Adds (i) threats of death or bodily injury to another person communicated in writing to such person or member of such person's family and (ii) threats to commit serious bodily harm to persons on school property to the list of offenses that a juvenile intake officer is required to report to the school division superintendent when a petition is filed alleging that a juvenile student committed such an offense. This bill is identical to HB 1787.
Title
Students; offenses reportable by juvenile intake officers to school division superintendents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 206 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1381ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101051D |