VA SB1406 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; staffing ratios; guidance counselors. Changes the name of guidance counselors to school counselors and requires school boards to employ school counselors in accordance with the following ratios: in elementary schools, one hour per day per 75 students, one full-time at 375 students, one hour per day additional time per 75 students or major fraction thereof; in middle schools, one period per 65 students, one full-time at 325 students, one additional period per 65 students or major fraction thereof; and in high schools, one period per 60 students, one full-time at 300 students, one additional period per 60 students or major fraction thereof. Such ratios would be effective with the 2019-2020 school year.
Title
Guidance counselors; staffing ratios, changes name to school counselors, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796) | |
2019-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 796 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1406ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Title replaced 19106756D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1406H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106756D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106756D-H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19102239D-E |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1406E |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102239D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 227.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 290.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |