VA SB1409 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Assisted living facilities; requirement for licensed administrator. Increases from one to two the number of times a licensed assisted living facility may operate under the supervision of an acting administrator during any two-year period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisted living facilities; requirement for licensed administrator.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 448 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1409ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-11HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1409S1
2019-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19104710D-S1
2019-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-29SenateRead second time
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 19104710D-S1
2019-01-25SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-10SenateRereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101961D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413103.1(n/a)See Bill Text
6321803(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1409
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1409+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1409S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1409ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0448+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0025+SB1409
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0047+SB1409
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0215SB1409+SB1409
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0243SB1409+SB1409
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0140+SB1409
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2620+SB1409
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0572SB1409+SB1409

Bill Comments

feedback