VA SB1412 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia National Guard; education grants. Increases from two to three the minimum number of years of remaining obligation that members of the Virginia National Guard are required to have to be eligible for the Virginia National Guard education grant. The bill provides that the grant may be used for vocational and nondegree credit courses and programs and that the cost of fees and textbooks will be included in the calculation of the amount of such grants. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Virginia National Guard; education grants, effective clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19102222D-E |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1412E |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102222D |