VA SB1414 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0867)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0867)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Liaison Office; Office of Intergovernmental Affairs; powers and duties. Changes the title of the Virginia Liaison Office to the Office of Intergovernmental Affairs. The bill also reorganizes and clarifies the responsibilities of the Office and removes a general policy statement regarding the support of federal efforts to encourage pooling of health insurance by small businesses.
Title
Virginia Liaison Office; changes title to Office of Intergovernmental Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0867) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 867 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1414ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1414ER) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11103520D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2479 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0827)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |