VA SB1415 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public adjusters. Provides that public adjusting includes soliciting an insured. The measure expands the list of activities in which any person other than a licensed public adjuster is prohibited from engaging to include (i) preparing, completing, or filing an insurance claim on behalf of an insured; (ii) aiding or acting on behalf of an insured in negotiating for or effecting the settlement of a claim for loss or damage covered by an insurance contract; (iii) advertising for employment as a public adjuster; or (iv) soliciting, investigating, or adjusting a claim on behalf of a public adjuster or an insured. The measure provides that an insured may void a contract he may have signed with a person who is not licensed as a public adjuster. The measure also requires that (a) the account into which funds received by a public adjuster on behalf of an insured toward the settlement of a claim be a noninterest-bearing account and (b) the public adjuster keep accurate and itemized records of the funds deposited into the account, which funds are required to be held separately from other funds and be reasonably ascertainable from the books of accounts and records of the public adjuster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public adjusters; regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 627 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1415ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102498D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3821845.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3821845.12(n/a)See Bill Text
3821845.13(n/a)See Bill Text
3821846.16(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback