VA SB1418 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0614)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0614)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; reregistration schedule. Changes the dates for required reregistration of persons on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry (the Registry) from a repeating specified number of days after initial registration to time periods corresponding to such person's birth month and the first letter of such person's last name. The time intervals for reregistration for each of the following four categories of reregistration do not materially change. The bill provides that (i) a person required to register, other than those persons convicted of a sexually violent offense or murder, shall reregister once each year during such person's birth month; current law is once each year from the date of initial registration; (ii) a person convicted of a sexually violent offense or murder shall reregister every three months, beginning in such person's birth month; current law is every 90 days from the date of initial registration; (iii) a person convicted of providing false information or failing to provide registration information, but not convicted of a sexually violent offense or murder, shall reregister every six months beginning with such person's birth month; current law is every 180 days from the date of such conviction; and (iv) a person convicted of providing false information or failing to provide registration information, when such person was included in the Registry for a sexually violent offense or murder, shall reregister every month; current law is every 30 days from the date of such conviction. The bill requires persons with a last name beginning with A through L to register from the first to the fifteenth of each required reporting month and persons with last names M through Z to register from the sixteenth to the last day of the month of each required reporting month. The bill also requires that for the period of July 1, 2020, to July 1, 2021, any person required to reregister shall continue to reregister with the State Police on such person's reregistration schedule in place prior to July 1, 2020, until such person has reregistered pursuant to the new reregistration schedule, at which time such person shall continue reregistering with the new schedule. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020. This bill is identical to HB 2089.
Title
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; reregistration schedule.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0614) | |
2019-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 614 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1418ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Watts, Leftwich, Ransone |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Mason, McDougle, Obenshain |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1418H1 |
2019-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106650D-H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106650D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103039D-E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1418E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103039D |