VA SB1420 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; alcoholic beverage licenses. Creates a coworking establishment license that allows facilities that have at least 100 members and offer shared office space to serve wine and beer to members and guests on the licensed premises. The bill imposes a $500 annual state tax and a $50 annual local tax on the license. The bill also creates a bespoke clothier establishment license that allows permanent retail establishments that offer, by appointment only, custom made apparel and that offer a membership program to customers to serve wine or beer for on-premises consumption upon the licensed premises approved by the Board to any member. The bill imposes a $100 annual state tax and a $20 annual local tax on the license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; alcoholic beverage licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 9-N 1-A) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1420ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
2019-02-19HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 2-N)
2019-02-19SenateConference substitute printed 19107261D-S1
2019-02-19 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-13HouseDelegates: Peace, Miyares, Aird
2019-02-13HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-13SenateSenators: Sturtevant, Mason, DeSteph
2019-02-13SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-13SenateSenate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N)
2019-02-13HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 9-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute (86-Y 9-N 1-A)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1420H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106897D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106897D-H1
2019-02-12HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 1-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
2019-01-18SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104044D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41100(n/a)See Bill Text
41206(n/a)See Bill Text
41231(n/a)See Bill Text
41233(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1420
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1420+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1420H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1420S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1420ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0628+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0009+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0172+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1420+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0330SB1420+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0022+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0245+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0031+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2766+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0606SB1420+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0621SB1420+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3092+SB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0842SB1420+SB1420

Bill Comments

feedback