VA SB1421 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Eminent domain; entry upon private property; calculation of just compensation; damages. Makes various changes to provisions related to entry upon private property in an eminent domain proceeding, including (i) requiring that the number of persons for whom permission to inspect the premises is sought be included in a request for permission to inspect private property for the purposes of a project wherein the power of eminent domain may be exercised; (ii) requiring the notice of intent to enter the property to include all of the information contained in the request for permission to inspect the property; (iii) requiring the court to award fees for up to three experts or as many experts as are called by the petitioner at trial, whichever is greater, if the petitioner damages the property during its entry; (iv) removing the requirement that the damage must be done maliciously, willfully, or recklessly for the owner to be reimbursed for his costs; and (v) removing the option that the owner may be reimbursed for his costs if the court awards the owner actual damages in an amount 30 percent or more greater than the petitioner's final written offer made no later than 30 days after the filing of an answer in circuit court or the return date in general district court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain; entry upon private property, calculation of just compensation, damages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 788 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1421ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with amendments (97-Y 2-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-20HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-17SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103612D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251203(n/a)See Bill Text
251230(n/a)See Bill Text
251230.1(n/a)See Bill Text
251312(n/a)See Bill Text
251419(n/a)See Bill Text
3321011(n/a)See Bill Text
3321024(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1421
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1421+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1421ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0788+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0055+SB1421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0023SB1421+SB1421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0053SB1421+SB1421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0075+SB1421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0334+SB1421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3152+SB1421
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0938SB1421+SB1421

Bill Comments

feedback