VA SB1425 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Local license tax; mobile food units. Provides that when the owner of a mobile food unit, defined as a restaurant mounted on wheels and readily moveable at any time during its operation, pays a license tax in the locality in which the mobile food unit is registered, no other license shall be required in any other locality in the Commonwealth. The exemption from paying the license tax in other localities will expire two years after the payment of the initial license tax in the locality in which the mobile food unit is registered. During the two-year exemption period, the owner may exempt up to three mobile food units from license taxation in other localities. Regardless of any license tax exemption, the owner must register with the commissioner of the revenue or director of finance in any locality in which he conducts business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License tax, local; mobile food units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N 2-A) (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 791 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1425ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-19SenateReconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateHouse amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N 2-A)
2019-02-18HousePassed House with amendment (62-Y 34-N 2-A)
2019-02-18HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-18HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-18HouseRead third time
2019-02-15HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseReported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N)
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N)
2019-02-01HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-24SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1425S1
2019-01-24SenateSubstitute by Senator Dunnavant agreed to 19105609D-S1
2019-01-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-24SenateFloor substitute printed 19105609D-S1 (Dunnavant)
2019-01-24SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-22SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-21SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-18SenateEngrossed by Senate
2019-01-18SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102489D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813715.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1425
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1425+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1425S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1425ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0791+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0064+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0062SB1425+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0086SB1425+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0159SB1425+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0160SB1425+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0161SB1425+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1001V0034+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0128+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2886+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0797SB1425+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0819SB1425+SB1425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0820SB1425+SB1425

Bill Comments

feedback