VA SB1426 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wills lodged in clerk's office for safekeeping. Permits the clerk of a circuit court to destroy a will that has been lodged in his office for safekeeping for 100 years or more.
Title
Clerks of circuit courts; retention of wills lodged in clerk's office for safekeeping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 529 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1426ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103578D-E |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1426E |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103578D |