VA SB1429 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Racing Commission; net pool wagering; retainage. Changes the name of the Executive Secretary of the Commission to the Executive Director. The bill, among other things, also (i) increases the number of permissible satellite facilities (OTBs) from 10 to 20, (ii) revises the definition of pari-mutuel wagering, (iii) removes the specific retainage percentage on pari-mutuel pools by the licensee and allows the Commission to approve an amount to be so retained as jointly requested by a recognized majority horseman's group and an unlimited licensee, (iv) allows the determination of population for the purposes of the referendum on the establishment of a racetrack or satellite facilities to be based on the U.S. Census or the National Planning Data Corporation or other similar recognized source, and (v) allows the officers, directors, partners, spouses, and immediate family members thereof of a tax-exempt entity granted a limited duration license for thoroughbred or harness racing with pari-mutuel wagering to make contributions to any candidate for public office or public office holder at the state or local level. The bill authorizes net pool wagering on simulcast horse racing transmitted from outside of Virginia. Under the bill, net pool wagering is defined as a method of pari-mutuel wagering whereby amounts are awarded to winning wagers relative to the contribution, net of takeouts, to a pool by each participating jurisdiction or, if applicable, site. The bill requires the Racing Commission to adopt emergency regulations. The bill incorporates
Title
Virginia Racing Commission; net pool wagering, retainage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1429S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104983D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Incorporates SB1333 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Incorporates SB1332 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104983D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 5-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104231D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Sporting Exhibitions, Events, and Facilities
Trade and Commerce
Sporting Exhibitions, Events, and Facilities
Trade and Commerce
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 372 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 378 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 378.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 382 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 387 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 390 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 391 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 392 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |