VA SB1429 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Onley. Shifts the town's municipal elections from May to November.
Title
Onley, Town of; amending charter, shifts municipal elections from May to November.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 9-N) (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 582 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1429ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House (85-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103632D |