VA SB143 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mortuary science education; practical experience required. Requires every public institution of higher education that offers a degree in mortuary science to require students to complete practical experience in the areas of funeral service and embalming prior to graduation from such program. The bill also provides that a person who is duly enrolled in a mortuary education program may assist in embalming while under the supervision of a funeral service licensee or embalmer with an active, unrestricted license issued by the Board of Funeral Directors and Embalmers, provided that such embalming occurs in a funeral service establishment licensed by the Board and in accordance with regulations promulgated by the Board.
Title
Mortuary science education; practical experience required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB143ER) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18101219D-E |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB143E |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101219D |