VA SB1435 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child welfare agencies and assisted living facilities; summary suspension. Allows the Commissioner of Social Services to issue an order of summary suspension of the license of any child welfare agency when conditions or practices exist that pose an immediate and substantial threat to the health, safety, and welfare of the children receiving care. The bill allows the Commissioner, in issuing an order of summary suspension, to suspend the license of the child welfare agency or to suspend only certain authority of the child welfare agency to operate, including the authority to provide certain services or perform certain functions that the Commissioner determines should be restricted or modified in order to protect the health, safety, or welfare of the children receiving care. The bill establishes notice, hearing, appeal, and posting requirements for such summary suspensions. The bill also amends the summary suspension procedures for licensed assisted living facilities to align such procedures with the summary suspension procedures established in the bill for child welfare agencies.
Title
Child welfare agencies; summary suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 449 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1435ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1435S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105294D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105294D-S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102035D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 1709.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1710.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1737 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |