VA SB1436 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mandatory reporters of child abuse or neglect; prenatal substance exposure. Requires any licensed hospital, whenever a health care provider in such hospital reports suspected child abuse or neglect resulting from prenatal substance exposure, to require the development of a written discharge plan that includes, among other things, appropriate treatment referrals and notice to the community services board of the jurisdiction in which the mother resides for the appointment of a discharge plan manager. The bill provides that such reports shall not constitute a per se finding of child abuse or neglect.
Title
Child abuse or neglect; prenatal substance exposure, mandatory reporters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0098) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 98 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1436ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1436S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105309D-S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105309D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103210D |