VA SB1439 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Death certificates; medical certification; electronic filing. Requires the completed medical certification portion of a death certificate to be filed electronically with the State Registrar of Vital Records through the Electronic Death Registration System and provides that, except for under certain circumstances, failure to file a medical certification of death electronically through the Electronic Death Registration System shall constitute grounds for disciplinary action by the Board of Medicine. The bill includes a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020, and a phased-in requirement for registration with the Electronic Death Registration System and electronic filing of medical certifications of death for various categories of health care providers. The bill directs the Department of Health to work with stakeholders to educate and encourage physicians, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners to timely register with and utilize the Electronic Death Registration System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Death certificate; medical certification, electronic filing w/State Registrar of Vital Records, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 224 (effective - see bill)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1439ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-11HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1439S1
2019-01-21SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105238D-S1
2019-01-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-21SenateRead second time
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateIncorporates SB1493 (Cosgrove)
2019-01-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105238D-S1
2019-01-11SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104122D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321263(n/a)See Bill Text
5412915(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1439
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1439+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1439S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1439ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0224+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0052+SB1439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0087SB1439+SB1439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0122SB1439+SB1439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0128+SB1439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2624+SB1439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0573SB1439+SB1439

Bill Comments

feedback