VA SB1441 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; eligibility of persons whose polling place prohibits firearms. Entitles any person who may otherwise lawfully carry a firearm to vote absentee if his polling place is located in a building or on property where such possession is prohibited by law or is prohibited by the owner of private property.
Title
Absentee voting; eligibility of persons whose polling place prohibits firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103337D |