VA SB1444 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Technology; transfer of duties to the Secretaries of Administration and Commerce and Trade. Transfers operational responsibilities of the Office of the Secretary of Technology to the Secretary of Administration and responsibilities related to commercialization and entrepreneurial support to the Secretary of Commerce and Trade. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Technology, Secretary of; transfer of duties to Secretaries of Administration & Commerce & Trade.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2019-02-24 | Senate | No further action taken |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Jones, S.C., Davis, Hayes |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Locke, DeSteph, Reeves |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendments (93-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment by Delegate Davis agreed to |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101037D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 203.2:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 205.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 213.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2221.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2233.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2240.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 225.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2485 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2698 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2738 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2817.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2822 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 436 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 437 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2911.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 322.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 497 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |