VA SB1448 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Eviction; writs of possession and eviction. Changes the terminology from writ of possession to writ of eviction for the writ executed by a sheriff to recover real property pursuant to an order of possession. The bill specifies that an order of possession remains effective for 180 days after being granted by the court and clarifies that any writ of eviction not executed within 30 days of its issuance shall be vacated as a matter of law, and no further action shall be taken by the clerk. As introduced, this bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission and is identical to HB 2007.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eviction; writs of possession and eviction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
2019-02-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 180 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1448ER)
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled
2019-02-12SenateTitle replaced 19105366D-H1
2019-02-12SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1448H1
2019-02-08HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105366D-H1
2019-02-08HouseRead third time
2019-02-07HouseRead second time
2019-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105366D-H1
2019-02-05HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104037D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16169.40(n/a)See Bill Text
171272(n/a)See Bill Text
5813947(n/a)See Bill Text
801128(n/a)See Bill Text
801129(n/a)See Bill Text
801293(n/a)See Bill Text
801470(n/a)See Bill Text
801471(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1448
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1448+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1448H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1448ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0180+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0047+SB1448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1448+SB1448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0178SB1448+SB1448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0179SB1448+SB1448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0180SB1448+SB1448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0238+SB1448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2582+SB1448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0517SB1448+SB1448

Bill Comments

feedback