VA SB145 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0867)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0867)
Summary
Natural gas utilities; recovery of capital costs. Establishes a mechanism for a natural gas utility that places a strategic natural gas facility into service on or after July 1, 2008, to recover the entire prudently incurred costs of the facility from the time construction is completed and the asset is placed in service until the State Corporation Commission establishes new rates. Recovery of these costs, which include an allowance for funds used during construction, shall be permitted by allowing the costs to be recorded in the utility's plant accounts and included in rate base for purposes of cost recovery in new rate schedules, in a rate base using the cost of service methodology, or in a performance-based regulation plan. Recovery shall be subject to Commission determination that the costs were prudently incurred. The measure neither authorizes nor denies the recovery of costs submitted to the Commission prior to January 1, 2008, where such costs were the subject of a final order that determined whether the costs were prudently incurred and provided for their accounting and ratemaking treatment.
Title
Natural gas utilities; recovery of funds for capital projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0867) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 867 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB145ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 1-N) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-04-22 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB145ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE #2 (91-Y 7-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed House with substitute (91-Y 7-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed House with substitute (94-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB145H1 | |
2008-03-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 089571332-H1 | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 089571332-H1 | |
2008-02-28 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned C & L sub: 1 | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB145S1 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080141332-S1 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080141332-S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Assigned C&L sub: Utilities | |
2008-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084619332 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB145 |