VA SB1452 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Dispensing of certain controlled substances and devices; limited license. Authorizes the Board of Pharmacy to issue a limited license at a reduced fee to a prescriber in a nonprofit facility to dispense controlled substances and devices for contraception or treatment of sexually transmitted disease. The bill requires such nonprofit facility to obtain a limited-use permit from the Board and comply with relevant Board regulations and exempts such facility from associated fees. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Dispensing of certain controlled substances and devices; limited license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Recommitted to Education and Health |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101468D |