VA SB1457 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Deposition of corporate officer. Provides that when an officer, as defined in the bill, who is called as a deposition witness files a motion for a protective order because the discovery sought by the deposition is obtainable from some other source that is more convenient, less burdensome, or less expensive, the burden is on the party seeking the deposition to defeat such a motion by showing that (i) the officer's deposition is reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence, (ii) the officer may have personal knowledge of discoverable information that cannot be discovered through other means, and (iii) a deposition of a representative other than the officer or other methods of discovery are unsatisfactory, insufficient, or inadequate. This bill is identical to HB 2167.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate officer; deposition witness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
2019-02-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 50 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-13SenateSigned by President
2019-02-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1457ER)
2019-02-12SenateEnrolled
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenatePassed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
2019-01-29SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N)
2019-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 19103759D-E
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1457E
2019-01-28SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-28SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2019-01-14SenateRereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103759D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801420.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1457
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1457+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1457E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1457ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0050+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0023+SB1457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0117+SB1457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1457+SB1457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0222SB1457+SB1457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0228SB1457+SB1457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0229SB1457+SB1457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0314+SB1457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2625+SB1457

Bill Comments

feedback