VA SB1459 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Port of Virginia Economic and Infrastructure Development Grant Fund and Program. Extends the sunset date from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2025, for the Port of Virginia Economic and Infrastructure Development Grant Fund and Program.
Title
Port of Virginia Economic & Infrastructure Development Grant Fund & Program; extends sunset date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 565 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1459ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102224D |