VA SB1461 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Council of Higher Education for Virginia; certification of certain programs; exemptions. Provides that any program of tutorial instruction that is delivered and designed to prepare an individual for an examination to demonstrate proficiency or to maintain proficiency in an occupational field is exempt from certification by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia.
Title
SCHEV; regulation of certain courses and programs of instruction, exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 599 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1461ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Title replaced 19106762D-H1 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1461H1 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106762D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106762D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1461S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105214D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105214D-S1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100182D |