VA SB1462 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive animal care; enforceable under Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Subjects provisions related to misrepresentation of animals' conditions to enforcement under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act (?§59.1-196 et seq.). The bill also increases from one year to two years following the date of sale the period of time for which a pet dealer is required to maintain a copy of the pet dealer's animal history certificate that is signed by the consumer.
Title
Comprehensive animal care; enforceable under Virginia Consumer Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 566 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1462ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1462S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105816D-S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105816D-S1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101012D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 6509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6513.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |