VA SB1464 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Manufacturer or distributor right of first refusal. Provides that a manufacturer or distributor's right to first refusal in the event of a proposed sale or transfer of a dealership does not apply if such sale or transfer is not to a dealer licensed anywhere in the United States as a dealer holding a franchise from any manufacturer or to a distributor licensed as a manufacturer or distributor in the Commonwealth unless the exercise of such right of first refusal by a manufacturer or distributor with a program promoting minority dealers would lead to a minority dealer having a majority ownership of a dealership. The bill exempts certain manufacturers and distributors from the limitations on the right of first refusal.
Title
Manufacturer or distributor; right of first refusal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 25-N) (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 25-N) (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 739 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1464ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-21 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Miyares, Hugo, Jones, J.C. |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senators: Cosgrove, Carrico, McPike |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-19 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 25-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendments (72-Y 25-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (19-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1464S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105630D-S1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105630D-S1 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101601D |