VA SB1474 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; members of the International Association of Fire Fighters. Changes the special license plates for members of the International Association of Fire Fighters from nonrevenue sharing to revenue sharing and provides for the moneys to support the efforts of various charitable organizations supported by the firefighters throughout the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to HB 2114.
Title
License plates, special; members of the International Association of Fire Fighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 80 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1474ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101458D |