VA SB1477 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0871)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0871)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the State Inspector General. Establishes the Office of the State Inspector General to be headed by a State Inspector General to investigate complaints alleging fraud, waste, abuse, or corruption by a state agency or nonstate agency or the officers and employees thereof. The bill also authorizes the State Inspector General to examine the management and operation of state agencies. The bill defines "nonstate agency" and provides a record exemption under the Freedom of Information Act for certain investigative/audit documents of the Office. The bill consolidates the offices of inspector general of the Departments of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Corrections, Juvenile Justice, and Transportation and the Department of the State Internal Auditor into this new office, and adds responsibility for tobacco indemnification and revitalization. The bill contains technical amendments and has a delayed effective date. The bill is identical to
Title
Inspector General, Office of State; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0871) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 871 (effective - see bill) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1477ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1477ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Title replaced 11105434D-H1 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1477H1 | |
2011-02-22 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105434D-H1 | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105434D-H1 | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1477S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105061D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105061D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11101804D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 323 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4344 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127.1:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 283 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 423 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |