VA SB1477 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Claims; Gary Linwood Bush. Provides relief in the amount of $520,163 to Gary Linwood Bush, who was wrongfully convicted of two bank robberies in 2007. In May 2018, after Mr. Bush served 11 years in prison, the Court of Appeals issued writs of actual innocence to Mr. Bush for both robberies after another person confessed and pled guilty to the robberies. The bill also allows Mr. Bush to receive career and technical training within the Virginia Community College System free of tuition charges, up to a maximum of $10,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Claims; Gary Linwood Bush.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 652 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1477ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 19103925D-E
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1477E
2019-02-01SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103925D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1477
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1477+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1477E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1477ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0652+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0167+SB1477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1477+SB1477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0320SB1477+SB1477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0204V0014+SB1477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0210+SB1477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3128+SB1477

Bill Comments

feedback