VA SB1486 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Summary judgment; limited use of discovery depositions and affidavits. Allows for the limited use of discovery depositions and affidavits in support of or in opposition to a motion for summary judgment, provided that the only parties to the action are business entities and the amount at issue is $50,000 or more. This bill is identical to HB 2197.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Summary judgment; limited use of discovery depositions and affidavits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Rejected by Senate (16-Y 21-N) (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #1 by Senator Surovell rejected (12-Y 26-N) (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
2019-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 128 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-13SenateSigned by President
2019-02-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1486ER)
2019-02-12SenateEnrolled
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2019-01-29SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate SB1486E
2019-01-28SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Surovell rejected
2019-01-28SenateReading of amendment #2 waived
2019-01-28SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Surovell rejected (12-Y 26-N)
2019-01-28SenateReading of amendment #1 waived
2019-01-28SenateSubstitute by Senator Peterson rejected 19105790D-S1 (16-Y 21-N)
2019-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-28SenateFloor substitute printed 19105790D-S1 (Petersen)
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103880D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801420(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1486
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1486+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1486S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1486ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0128+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0128+SB1486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1486+SB1486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0214SB1486+SB1486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0213SB1486+SB1486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0226SB1486+SB1486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0230SB1486+SB1486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0231SB1486+SB1486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0315+SB1486
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2628+SB1486

Bill Comments

feedback