VA SB1488 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; causes of high state hospital census; report. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to convene a stakeholder work group to examine the causes of the high census at the Commonwealth's state hospitals for individuals with mental illness, including (i) the impact on such census of the practice of conducting evaluations of individuals who are the subject of an emergency custody order in hospital emergency departments, the treatment needs of individuals with complex medical conditions, the treatment needs of individuals who are under the influence of alcohol or other controlled substances, and the need to ensure that individuals receive treatment in the most appropriate setting to meet their physical and behavioral health care needs and (ii) the potential impact on such census of extending the time frame during which an emergency custody order remains valid, revising security requirements to allow custody of a person who is the subject of an emergency custody order to be transferred from law enforcement to a hospital emergency department, diverting individuals who are the subject of an emergency custody order from hospital emergency departments to other more appropriate locations for medical and psychological evaluations, and preventing unnecessary use of hospital emergency department resources by improving the efficiency of the evaluation process. The work group shall analyze how such issues affect both adults and children. The work group shall develop recommendations for both long-term and short-term solutions to the high census at the Commonwealth's state hospitals for individuals with mental illness and shall report such recommendations to the Chairmen of the Joint Subcommittee to Study Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the Twenty-First Century, the House Committee on Appropriations, the House Committee for Courts of Justice, the Senate Committee on Finance, and the Senate Committee for Courts of Justice by November 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State hospital for individuals w/ mental illness; SHHR to examine cause of high census at hospital.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 609 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1488ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-23SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1488S1
2019-01-22SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19104970D-S1
2019-01-22SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-22SenateRead second time
2019-01-21SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 19104970D-S1
2019-01-17SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102676D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1488
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1488+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1488S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1488ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0609+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0067+SB1488
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0087SB1488+SB1488
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0079+SB1488
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0141SB1488+SB1488
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H2001V0066+SB1488
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H20V0147+SB1488
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3129+SB1488

Bill Comments

feedback