VA SB1490 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Financial exploitation of aged or incapacitated adults; authority to refuse transactions or disbursements. Authorizes financial institution staff to refuse to execute a transaction, to delay a transaction, or to refuse to disburse funds, regardless of whether such staff has reported suspected financial exploitation, if the financial institution staff (i) believes in good faith that the transaction or disbursement may involve, facilitate, result in, or contribute to the financial exploitation of an aged or incapacitated adult or (ii) makes, or has actual knowledge that another person has made, a report to the local department of social services or adult protective services hotline stating a good faith belief that the transaction or disbursement may involve, facilitate, result in, or contribute to the financial exploitation of an aged or incapacitated adult. The measure authorizes financial institution staff to continue to refuse to execute a transaction, delay a transaction, or refuse to disburse funds for not more than 30 business days after the date such transaction or disbursement was initially requested on the basis of such a good faith belief, unless otherwise ordered by a court. The measure authorizes such staff, to the extent permitted by law, to report any information or records relevant to an investigation. A financial institution and its staff are immune from civil or criminal liability, absent gross negligence or willful misconduct, for refusing to execute a transaction, delaying a transaction, or refusing to disburse funds pursuant to this measure. This bill incorporates SB 1175 and is identical to HB 1987.
Title
Aged or incapacitated adults; financial exploitation, authority to refuse transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 421 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1490ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 19107521D-S2 |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-20 | House | Delegates: Ware, Hugo, Filler-Corn |
2019-02-20 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, McDougle, Spruill |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-18 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1490H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106594D-H1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106594D-H1 |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1490S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105408D-S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Incorporates SB1175 (McPike) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105408D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104181D |