VA SB1491 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0641)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; school districts; hiring of relatives of superintendent. Allows a school district to hire a relative of the division superintendent if (i) the superintendent certifies that he had no involvement with the hiring decision and (ii) the assistant superintendent certifies to the members of the governing body in writing that the employment is based upon merit and fitness and the competitive rating of the qualifications of the individual and that the superintendent had no involvement with the hiring decision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; school boards and school employees, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 22-N) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0641)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 641 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1491ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 22-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House (78-Y 22-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 6-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1491S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106376D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106376D-S1
2019-02-01SenateReported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103302D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223119(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1491
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1491+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1491S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1491ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0641+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S10V0018+SB1491
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1491+SB1491
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0429SB1491+SB1491
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0418SB1491+SB1491
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0091+SB1491
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0370+SB1491
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3148+SB1491

Bill Comments

feedback