VA SB1492 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

FOIA; exclusions; proprietary records and trade secrets; Virginia Telecommunication Initiative. Excludes trade secrets, financial information, and research-related information supplied to the Department of Housing and Community Development (the Department) as part of any grant application submitted to the Department pursuant to certain requirements set out in the Code or pursuant to the Virginia Growth and Opportunity Board or the Virginia Telecommunication Initiative as authorized by the appropriation act from the mandatory disclosure provisions of FOIA, if such disclosure would be harmful to the competitive position of the applicant. The bill provides that in order for such trade secrets, financial information, and research-related information to be excluded, the applicant shall (i) invoke this exclusion upon submission of the data or other materials for which protection from disclosure is sought, (ii) identify with specificity the data or other materials for which protection is sought, and (iii) state the reasons why protection is necessary. The Department is directed to determine whether the requested exclusion from disclosure is necessary to protect the trade secrets or confidential proprietary information of the applicant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA; exclusions, proprietary records and trade secrets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1492ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House (95-Y 4-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 19102327D-E
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1492E
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateAssigned GL&T sub: #1
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102327D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223705.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1492
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1492+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1492E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1492ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0629+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0073+SB1492
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1492+SB1492
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1492+SB1492
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0029+SB1492
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0273+SB1492
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3031+SB1492

Bill Comments

feedback