VA SB1493 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Community College; computer science training and professional development for teachers. Requires Northern Virginia Community College (i) in consultation with the Department of Education, to contract with a partner organization to develop, market, and implement high-quality and effective computer science training and professional development activities for public school teachers throughout the Commonwealth for the purpose of improving the computer science literacy of all public school students in the Commonwealth and (ii) to establish an advisory committee for the purpose of advising the college and its partner organization on the development, marketing, and implementation of such training and professional development activities. This bill is identical to HB 1663.
Title
Northern Va. Community College, et al.; computer science training, etc., for public school teachers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1493ER2) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1493ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 17105821D-S3 |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Greason, Leftwich, Bulova |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Dunnavant, Peake |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | House requested conference committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1493H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105524D-H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105524D-H1 |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1493S2 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105136D-S2 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 17104892D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105136D-S2 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104892D-S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103742D |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Public Schools
Teachers
Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Public Schools
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 208.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.1:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |