VA SB1499 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Motor Vehicles hearings; motor vehicle dealers; report. Requires the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to provide to the Motor Vehicle Dealer Board or person reporting an alleged violation with regard to motor vehicle dealers certain information regarding investigations and hearings. The bill requires the Commissioner to report by December 1, 2019, and December 1, 2020, to the Chairmen of the House and Senate Committees on Transportation on the volume and nature of any alleged violations received by the Department and the resulting actions taken by the Commissioner when he is provided with information indicating a possible violation involving motor vehicle dealer franchises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles, Department of; hearings, motor vehicle dealers, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1499ER)
2019-02-21SenateEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseRead third time
2019-02-15HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 19105498D-ES1
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1499ES1
2019-01-28SenateAmendment by Senator DeSteph agreed to
2019-01-28SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105498D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105498D-S1
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103968D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621573(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1499
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1499+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1499S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1499ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1499ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0751+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0036+SB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1499+SB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1499+SB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1903V0023+SB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0111+SB1499
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2880+SB1499

Bill Comments

feedback