VA SB1501 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Capital murder; law-enforcement officers and fire marshals; mandatory minimum. Provides that any person convicted of capital murder of a law-enforcement officer or certain other public safety officials who was 18 years of age or older at the time of the offense shall be sentenced to no less than a mandatory minimum term of confinement for life. This bill is identical to HB 2615.
Title
Capital murder; punishment if against law-enforcement officers and fire marshals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 717 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1501ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House (93-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1501S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105751D-S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105751D-S1 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100824D |