VA SB1510 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Police-requested towing; local regulation. Provides that only towing requests made by local law-enforcement officers are subject to local ordinances regulating towing services for unattended, abandoned, or immobile vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Towing; requests made by local law-enforcement officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 630 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1510ER)
2019-02-21SenateEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseRead third time
2019-02-15HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 19101888D-E
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1510E
2019-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101888D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621217(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1510
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1510+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1510E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1510ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0630+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0067+SB1510
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1510+SB1510
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1510+SB1510
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0348SB1510+SB1510
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1903V0021+SB1510
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0113+SB1510
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2882+SB1510

Bill Comments

feedback