VA SB1511 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Southwest Virginia Higher Education Center. Requires the board of trustees of the Southwest Virginia Higher Education Center to seek opportunities to collaborate with local comprehensive community colleges to meet specialized noncredit workforce training needs identified by industry. The bill provides that if the local comprehensive community college is unable to meet such needs, then the board of trustees may seek to collaborate with other education providers or may provide Center-delivered specialized noncredit workforce training independent of local comprehensive community colleges.
Title
Southwest Virginia Higher Education Center; powers and duties of board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 766 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1511ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100934D |