VA SB1516 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Corrections; disclosure of information; delivery of controlled substances to prisoners. Requires the Director of the Department of Health Professions, upon receiving a request for information, to disclose to an investigator for the Department of Corrections who has completed the Virginia State Police Drug Diversion School and who has been designated by the Director of the Department of Corrections information relevant to a specific investigation of a specific individual into a possible unlawful delivery of a controlled substance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOC; disclosure of information, delivery of controlled substances to prisoners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 679 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1516ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1516S1
2019-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105895D-S1
2019-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-29SenateRead second time
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105895D-S1
2019-01-25SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101857D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412523(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1516
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1516+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1516S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1516ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0679+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0053+SB1516
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0215SB1516+SB1516
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0243SB1516+SB1516
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0022+SB1516
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0050+SB1516
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2954+SB1516
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2997+SB1516

Bill Comments

feedback