VA SB1520 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles records; certain private vendors; penalty. Requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to release certain vehicle owner data, upon request, to a private vendor operating a video-monitoring system on or in a school bus. The bill limits how such data can be used and stored and provides that any person who unlawfully discloses such data is subject to a civil penalty of $1,000 for each disclosure. The bill provides that drivers required to stop for a stopped school bus shall remain stopped until the school bus is put in motion. This bill is identical to HB 2344.
Title
Motor Vehicles, Department of; records released to certain private vendors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 544 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1520ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1520S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105659D-S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Incorporates SB1476 (Deeds) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105659D-S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103029D |