VA SB1521 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0842)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Handheld photo speed monitoring devices. Requires the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security to review and report on the proposed use of handheld photo speed monitoring devices and any legal or constitutional implications of dedicating civil penalties to a fund other than the Literary Fund. Subject to a reenactment clause, the bill provides that the Department of State Police may operate a handheld photo speed monitoring device, defined in the bill, in or around a highway work zone for the purpose of recording images of vehicles that are traveling at speeds of at least 12 miles per hour above the posted highway work zone speed limit within such highway work zone when (i) workers are present and (ii) such highway work zone is indicated by appropriately placed signs displaying the maximum speed limit and the use of such handheld automated speed monitoring device. The bill also provides that the operator of a vehicle shall be liable for a monetary civil penalty, not to exceed $125, if such vehicle is found to be traveling at speeds of at least 12 miles per hour above the posted highway work zone speed limit by the handheld photo monitoring device.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handheld photo speed monitoring devices; DSP/law-enfrmt. may operate in or around a hwy. work zone.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (30-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (30-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0842)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 842 (effective - see bill)
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1521ER2)
2019-04-03SenateReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 1-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (30-Y 8-N)
2019-03-26SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1521ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (30-Y 8-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with amendment (74-Y 24-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-11HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseReported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 19103500D-E
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1521E
2019-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-04SenateRead second time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Transportation with amendment (10-Y 3-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103500D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462882(n/a)See Bill Text
462882.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1521
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1521+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1521E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1521ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1521ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0842+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0071+SB1521
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1521+SB1521
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0355SB1521+SB1521
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0376SB1521+SB1521
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0088+SB1521
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2660+SB1521
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0543SB1521+SB1521
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1143SB1521+SB1521
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3435+SB1521

Bill Comments

feedback