VA SB1523 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's secretaries; Secretary of Workforce Development created. Creates in the Governor's cabinet the position of Secretary of Workforce Development (the Secretary). The bill assigns to the Secretary responsibility for the Department of Labor and Industry and the Virginia Employment Commission. The bill also removes the position of Chief Workforce Development Advisor and reassigns that position's responsibilities to the Secretary.
Title
Workforce Development, Secretary of; created, Economic Crisis Strike Force membership.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19105369D-ES1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1523ES1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105369D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105369D-S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104262D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2471 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2471.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2472 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2472.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |