VA SB1534 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Coal combustion residuals; cleanup costs. Authorizes an electric utility to recover the costs of the permitted cleanup in the Chesapeake Bay watershed of coal combustion residuals that are generated from the burning of coal for the purpose of generating electricity. The bill provides that such cleanup costs shall be recovered over a 25-year period and shall not include any adjustments or compensation intended to compensate the utility for carrying costs, the length of the period of reimbursement, or interest on funds advanced by the utility or any rate of return on such funds. This bill was incorporated into SB 1355.
Title
Coal combustion residuals; cleanup costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Commerce and Labor (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Incorporated by Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Coal Ash Subcommittee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103866D |