VA SB1537 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Property Owners' Association Act; home-based businesses. Provides that if a development is located in a locality classifying home-based child care services as an accessory or ancillary residential use under the locality's zoning ordinance, the provision of home-based child care services in a personal residence shall be deemed a residential use unless (i) expressly prohibited or restricted by the declaration or (ii) restricted by the association's bylaws or rules. The bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission. This bill is identical to HB 1853.
Title
Virginia Property Owners' Association Act; home-based businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 30 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1537ER) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104259D |