VA SB1541 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

No-fault divorce; waiver of service. Clarifies that in the case of a no-fault divorce, waivers of service of process may occur within a reasonable time prior to or after the suit is filed, provided that a copy of the complaint is attached to such waiver, or otherwise provided to the defendant, and the final decree of divorce as proposed by the complainant is signed by the defendant. Where a defendant has waived service of process and, where applicable, notice, the bill further permits depositions to be taken, affidavits to be given, and all papers related to the divorce proceeding to be filed contemporaneously. This bill is identical to HB 1945.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No-fault divorce; waiver of service of process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 237 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1541ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateTitle replaced 19106444D-H1
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1541H1
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106444D-H1
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106444D-H1
2019-02-06HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100909D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1541
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1541+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1541H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1541ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0237+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0103+SB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0134SB1541+SB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0158SB1541+SB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0317+SB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2631+SB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0576SB1541+SB1541

Bill Comments

feedback