VA SB1542 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil actions; determination of indigency. Provides that, in the case of a no-fault divorce proceeding, a person who is a current recipient of a state or federally funded public assistance program for the indigent shall not be subject to fees and costs. The bill further provides that, in such no-fault divorce proceeding, such person shall certify to the receipt of such benefits under oath.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions; determination of indigency, no-fault divorce.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1542ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateTitle replaced 19106445D-S1
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N)
2019-02-13SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1542H1
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106445D-H1
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106445D-H1
2019-02-06HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1542S1
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105303D-S1
2019-01-23SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-23SenateRead second time
2019-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105303D-S1
2019-01-21SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100908D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171606(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1542
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1542+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1542S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1542H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1542ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0730+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0106+SB1542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0134SB1542+SB1542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0170SB1542+SB1542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0318+SB1542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2632+SB1542
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0545SB1542+SB1542

Bill Comments

feedback